VA HB603 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0274)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0274)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' Compensation Commission; notices. Authorizes the Workers' Compensation Commission to satisfy its obligations to provide copies of notices, opinions, orders, and awards by sending them by electronic communications in the manner prescribed by the Commission.
Title
Workers' Compensation Commission; notices, orders, etc., by electronic communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0274) | |
2010-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 274 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB603ER) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-01-27 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-25 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-21 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101480D |