VA HB584 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB584
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Personnel Act; hiring preference in state government for persons with disabilities. Establishes a hiring preference in state government for persons with disabilities, provided that such person meets all of the knowledge, skill, and ability requirements for the available position. The bill defines the term "preference" as requiring that a person with a disability be hired over a person without a disability when the two individuals are substantially equal in qualifications for an eligible position.
Title
Virginia Personnel Act; hiring preference in state government for persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Alex Askew [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Richard Sullivan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in General Laws |
2020-02-04 | House | Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-24 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Adminstrative Process |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100079D |
Same As/Similar To
HB584 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote