VA HB581 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0409)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0409)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nurse practitioners; practicing outside of a patient care team. Provides that in cases in which a physician who is serving as a patient care team physician dies, becomes disabled, retires from active practice, surrenders his license or has it suspended or revoked by the Board of Medicine, or relocates his practice such that he is no longer able to serve, and a nurse practitioner who was part of the patient care team is unable to enter into a new practice agreement with another patient care team physician, the nurse practitioner may continue to practice without a patient care team physician for an initial period not to exceed 60 days upon notification to the designee of the Boards of Medicine and Nursing. The initial period may be extended for a period not to exceed 60 additional days upon approval of the Boards' designee, provided that the nurse practitioner provides evidence of efforts made to secure another patient care team physician and of access to physician input.
Title
Nurse practitioners; practicing outside of a patient care team.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0409) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0409) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 409 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB581ER) |
2016-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE(99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB581H1 |
2016-02-11 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105061D-H1 |
2016-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105061D-H1 |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N) |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101994D |
Same As/Similar To
SB264 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0308)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2957 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2957.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |