VA HB579 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB579
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; coverage for mammograms. Requires health insurers, on and after January 1, 2021, to provide coverage for low-dose screening mammograms at rates that are more frequent than is currently required if the covered individual has a family history of breast cancer. If the individual has a family history of breast cancer, the bill requires coverage for annual mammograms from age 30 through 49 and biannual mammograms starting at age 50. However, the age at which such coverage of annual mammograms starts shall be younger than 30 if the covered individual's mother was diagnosed with breast cancer at an age earlier than 40, in which event coverage starts during the year that the individual attains an age that is 10 years younger than the age of the individual's mother at the time of her diagnosis.
Title
Health insurance; coverage for mammograms.
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Carrie Coyner [R] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Martha Mugler [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-21 | House | Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2020-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102080D |
Same As/Similar To
HB579 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote