VA HB578 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0972)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0972)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Smoking in motor vehicle with a minor present. Expands the group in the presence of whom it is illegal to smoke in a motor vehicle from minors under the age of eight to minors under the age of 15.
Title
Smoking; illegal in motor vehicle when a minor under the age of 15 is present.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 43-N) (Y: 52 N: 43 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 9-N) (Y: 6 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 39-N) (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 9-N) (Y: 6 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 39-N) (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0972) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 972 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB578ER) |
2020-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 43-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (52-Y 43-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (23-Y 17-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendments (8-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reconsiderd by Transportation |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 39-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 39-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from Transportation (16-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100081D |