VA HB575 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1208)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electric utilities; energy efficiency programs; stakeholder process. Requires the stakeholder process to be used by American Electric Power and Dominion Energy Virginia to provide input and feedback on compliance with the total annual energy savings and how such savings affect utility integrated resource plans, recommended policy reforms by which the General Assembly or the State Corporation Commission can ensure maximum and cost-effective deployment of energy efficiency technology across the Commonwealth, and best practices for evaluation, measurement, and verification for the purposes of assessing compliance with the total annual energy savings. The measure also requires each utility's stakeholder process to include the participation of relevant directors, relevant deputies, and staff members of the Commission who participate in approval and oversight of utility energy efficiency savings programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric utilities; energy efficiency programs, stakeholder process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1208)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1208 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled bill text (HB575ER2)
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2020-04-22SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (95-Y 0-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2020-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-04-11HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB575ER)
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled
2020-03-02HouseVOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20108899D-S1 (100-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-27SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB575S1
2020-02-27SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108899D-S1
2020-02-27SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-27SenateRead third time
2020-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108899D-S1
2020-02-24SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-30HouseRead first time
2020-01-28HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101923D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB575&201+sum+HB575
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB575+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB575S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB575ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB575ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1208+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1403V0004+HB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0068+HB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0100+HB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0297+HB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0205+HB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1050HB0575+HB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1156HB0575+HB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1684+HB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2007HB0575+HB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2044HB0575+HB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2045HB0575+HB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2140+HB0575

Bill Comments

feedback