VA HB571 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Unlawful consumption, purchase, or possession of alcohol. Clarifies that it is an affirmative defense to a charge of unlawful consumption, purchase, or possession of any alcoholic beverage if the defendant shows that such consumption, purchase, or possession was allowed under the current exemptions to licensure under the ABC law. The bill provides that it is declaratory of existing law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol; unlawful consumption, purchase, or possession.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N) (Y: 2 N: 96 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseFailed to pass
2018-03-10HouseNo further action taken
2018-03-08SenateSenators: Surovell, Cosgrove, McDougle
2018-03-08SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-07HouseDelegates: Habeeb, Bell, Robert B., Mullin
2018-03-07HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-07HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-03-06SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-03-06SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05HouseVOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N)
2018-03-05HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 18107677D-S1 (2-Y 96-N)
2018-03-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-01SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N)
2018-03-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB571S1
2018-03-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107677D-S1
2018-03-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-03-01SenateRead third time
2018-02-28SenatePassed by for the day
2018-02-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107677D-S1
2018-02-26SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
2018-02-16SenateRereferred to Courts of Justice
2018-02-16SenateRereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2018-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-09HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08HousePrinted as engrossed 18101985D-E
2018-02-08HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB571E
2018-02-08HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-08HouseRead second time
2018-02-07HouseRead first time
2018-02-05HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101985D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41305(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB571
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB571+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB571E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB571S1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0801V0139+HB0571
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0058+HB0571
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0469+HB0571
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S09V0072+HB0571
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0366+HB0571
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0741HB0571+HB0571
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0810HB0571+HB0571
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1280+HB0571
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0937HB0571+HB0571

Bill Comments

feedback