VA HB570 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0056)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0056)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dismissal of teachers; grounds; incompetency. Removes the definition of "incompetency" for the purpose of establishing grounds for the dismissal of public school teachers.
Title
Teachers, public school; grounds for dismissal.
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Chris Hurst [D] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0056) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 56 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 2, 2020 | |
2020-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB570ER) |
2020-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 42-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB570H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20105738D-H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 20105738D-H1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101537D |
Same As/Similar To
SB167 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0168)