VA HB564 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-29 - House: Incorporated by General Laws (HB320-Cox) by voice vote
Status: Introduced on January 7 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-29 - House: Incorporated by General Laws (HB320-Cox) by voice vote
Summary
Statewide Fire Prevention Code; fees for inspection; exceptions. Provides that the State Fire Marshal may not charge any fee for permits issued for inspection of any school, public or private. The bill contains a sunset provision of July 1, 2010. This bill was incorporated into
Title
Fire Prevention Code; fees for inspection, exceptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-29 | House: Incorporated by General Laws (HB320-Cox) by voice vote | |
2008-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: Housing | |
2008-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081203480 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB564 |