VA HB549 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Real property taxes; notice by mail of proposed increase. Requires localities, after conducting a reassessment of real estate, to provide notice to property owners by mail of certain information prior to adopting a tax rate that would increase the amount of real property tax collected above 101 percent of the prior year's tax collections. The bill requires the notice to include (i) the dollar and percentage amount of increase that the proposed tax rate would levy on the owner's particular property compared to the previous year's tax levy, (ii) the tax levy on the owner's particular property for the previous tax year and the proposed levy for the current tax year, and (iii) all of the information regarding the proposed tax rate that under current law is required to be posted in a newspaper and a prominent public location.
Title
Real property taxes; notice by mail of proposed increase.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Finance |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100634D |