VA HB549 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-12 - Tabled in Courts of Justice (12-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-12 - Tabled in Courts of Justice (12-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Birth control; definition. Adds a definition of birth control: "Birth control" means contraceptive methods that are approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration. Birth control shall not be considered abortion for the purposes of Title 18.2.
Title
Birth control; definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - House - House: Tabled in Courts of Justice (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | House | Tabled in Courts of Justice (12-Y 9-N) |
2016-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-04 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Constitutional Law |
2016-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102061D |