VA HB546 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Prescribing of Schedule VI controlled substances; telemedicine; store-and-forward technologies. Provides that electronic technology or media used for telemedicine services includes store-and-forward technologies and that, used in the context of prescribing Schedule VI controlled substances through telemedicine services, "store-and-forward technologies" means technologies that allow for the electronic transmission of medical information, including images, documents, or health histories, through a secure communications system.
Title
Prescribing of Schedule VI controlled substances; telemedicine, store-and-forward technologies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104874D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3418.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |