VA HB546 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Additional powers of certain counties. Grants counties with a population density greater than 2,000 persons per square mile certain powers related to taxation, borrowing, and payments for highway maintenance. Such powers currently are generally granted to cities and towns.
Title
Certain counties; additional powers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | Left in Finance |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-02 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102064D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3840 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB546 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB546+hil |