VA HB546 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Motor carriers of passengers; permits. Requires that contract bus carriers and contract passenger carriers obtain a permit from the Department of Motor Vehicles before operating on the highways in the Commonwealth.
Title
Motor carriers of passengers; requires permits from DMV before operating on highways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-03 | House: Left in Transportation | |
2010-01-28 | House: Continued to 2011 in Transportation by voice vote | |
2010-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-01-22 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101544D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 2096 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2097.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2099.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB546 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB546+hil |