VA HB540 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0497)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0497)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Licensure of private behavioral health services providers. Clarifies provisions governing issuance of a provisional license to a private provider by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, providing that a provisional license may be issued at any time when a provider is temporarily unable to comply with all licensing standards, and clarifies situations in which certain sanctions may be imposed upon a provider.
Title
Private behavioral health services providers; licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0497) | |
2014-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 497 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB540ER) |
2014-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB540H1 |
2014-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104196D-H1 |
2014-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104196D-H1 |
2014-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned HWI sub: # 2 |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100846D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 2 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 415 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 418 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 419 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |