VA HB539 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0072)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0072)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prescription Monitoring Program; delegation of authority. Authorizes dispensers who are authorized to access the information in the possession of the Prescription Monitoring Program to delegate this authority to certain health care professionals employed at the same facility and under their direct supervision. The bill also changes the requirements for individuals to whom such authority may be delegated by prescribers or dispensers to include health care professionals licensed, registered, or certified by a health regulatory board in another state and employed at the same facility and under their direct supervision.
Title
Prescription Monitoring Program; delegation of authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0072) | |
2014-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 72 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB539ER) |
2014-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (91-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-16 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned HWI sub: # 1 |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101227D |