VA HB538 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0496)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0496)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Autism Advisory Council; sunset extended. Extends the sunset date for the Autism Advisory Council from July 1, 2014, to July 1, 2016.
Title
Autism Advisory Council; extends sunset provision to July 1, 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED #2 (1-Y 96-N) (Y: 1 N: 98 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED #2 (1-Y 96-N) (Y: 1 N: 98 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0496) | |
2014-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 496 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB538ER) |
2014-03-17 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-06 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-06 | House | Conference substitute printed 14105564D-H1 |
2014-03-06 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Puller, Locke, Hanger |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Delegates: Plum, Landes, Ware |
2014-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2014-03-04 | House | House acceded to request |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | VOTE: REJECTED #2 (1-Y 96-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 14105142D-S1 (1-Y 96-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House |
2014-02-27 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105142D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB538S1 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14105142D-S1 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14105142D-S1 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 14100989D-E |
2014-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB538E |
2014-02-05 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100989D |
Same As/Similar To
SB415 (Same As) 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0537)