VA HB530 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB530

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Health care coverage; qualified health plans. Requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services, in collaboration with the State Corporation Commission, to contract with health carriers to offer qualified health plans on the health benefit exchange beginning January 1, 2022. The bill provides that such qualified health plans are designed to reduce deductibles, make more services available before the deductible is met, provide predictable cost sharing, maximize subsidies, limit adverse premium impacts, reduce barriers to maintaining and improving health, encourage choice based on value, and limit adverse premium impacts and increases in premium rates. The bill requires that any health carrier contracted with the Department to offer such qualified health plans (i) is licensed and in good standing to offer health insurance coverage in the Commonwealth and (ii) offers at least one qualified health plan at a silver level of coverage and one qualified health plan at a gold level of coverage. The bill provides that any fee-for-service rates for providers and facilities under any such qualified health plan cannot exceed the Medicare rates for the same or similar covered services, and for reimbursement other than fee-for-service, the aggregate amount the qualified health plan pays to providers and facilities cannot exceed the equivalent of the aggregate amount the qualified health plan would have reimbursed providers using fee-for-service Medicare rates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage; qualified health plans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Labor and Commerce
2020-01-30HouseContinued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2020-01-22HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-22HouseReferred from Finance by voice vote
2020-01-05HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-01-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102153D

Same As/Similar To

HB530 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321329.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback