VA HB526 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Solicitation of contributions; registration of charitable organization; fees. Reduces fees for the registration of charitable organizations that intend to solicit contributions within the Commonwealth. The bill also contains technical amendments.
Title
Charitable organization; registration fees, solicitation of contributions.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 4-N 1-A) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-01-31 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102305D |
Same As/Similar To
SB408 (Similar To) 2024-02-06 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N)
Subjects
Charitable Civic and Volunteer Institutions and Organizations
Religious and Charitable Matters; Cemeteries
Religious and Charitable Matters; Cemeteries