VA HB526 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB526
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Coverage for reproductive health services. Requires Coverage for reproductive health services. Requires health benefit plans to cover the costs of specified health care services, drugs, devices, products, and procedures related to reproductive health, including (i) well-woman preventive visits; (ii) counseling for sexually transmitted infections; (iii) screening for certain conditions; (iv) folic acid supplements; (v) breastfeeding support, counseling, and supplies; (vi) breast cancer chemoprevention counseling; (vii) contraceptive drugs, devices, or products; (viii) voluntary sterilization; and (ix) any additional preventive services for women that must be covered without cost sharing under federal law as of January 1, 2019. The mandated coverage does not include abortion services other than when performed when the life of the mother is endangered by a physical disorder, physical illness, or physical injury, including a life-endangering physical condition caused by or arising from the pregnancy itself, or when the pregnancy is the result of an alleged act of rape or incest. The measure provides an exemption for plans sold to religious employers. Carriers are prohibited from excluding a covered person from participating in, being denied the benefits of, or otherwise being subjected to discrimination in the coverage of or payment for reproductive health services, and a violation constitutes an unfair trade practice. The health benefit plan requirements become effective when a plan is delivered, issued for delivery, reissued, or extended in the Commonwealth on and after January 1, 2021, or at any time thereafter when any term of the health benefit plan is changed or any premium adjustment is made.
Title
Reproductive health services; health benefit plans to cover the costs of specified services, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-30 | House | Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2020-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103313D |
Same As/Similar To
HB526 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3407.5:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB526 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB526+hil |