VA HB525 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Carnal knowledge of pretrial or posttrial offender; bail bondsmen; penalty. Increases to a Class 6 felony from a Class 1 misdemeanor the penalty for an owner or employee of a bail bond company that posted bond for a person to carnally know such person if the owner or employee has the authority to revoke the person's bond.
Title
Carnal knowledge of pretrial or posttrial offender; bail bondsmen, increases penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103323D |