VA HB519 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School-affiliated entities; student personal information. Extends various protections for student information that is collected and maintained, used, or shared on certain websites, mobile applications, or online services used by school-affiliated entities. The bill defines "school-affiliated entity" as any private entity that provides support to a local school division or a public elementary or secondary school in the Commonwealth, including alumni associations, booster clubs, parent-teacher associations, parent-teacher-student associations, parent-teacher organizations, public education foundations, public education funds, and scholarship organizations.
Title
School-affiliated entities; definition, providing protection for student personal information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468) | |
2016-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 468 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB519ER) |
2016-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB519H1 |
2016-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105306D-H1 |
2016-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105306D-H1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2016-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100516D |