VA HB516 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0002)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0002)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income taxes. Advances the date as of which Virginia income tax laws conform with the Internal Revenue Code from December 31, 2010, to December 31, 2011; restores conformity to certain provisions of the federal earned income tax credit for taxable year 2011 for purposes of Virginia's low-income taxpayer income tax credit; and reinstates the age deduction for individuals born on or before January 1, 1939, that was inadvertently deleted by Chapter 851 of the Acts of Assembly of 2011. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Income tax, state; advances conformity with federal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0002) | |
2012-02-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 2 (effective 2/7/12) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-01-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-01-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB516ER) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-19 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 2-N) | |
2012-01-19 | House: Read third time and passed House (98-Y 2-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-01-18 | House: Speaker ruled Amendment by Delegate Marshall, R.G. not germane | |
2012-01-18 | House: Read second time | |
2012-01-17 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-16 | House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/11/12 12103510D |
Same As/Similar To
SB463 (Same As) 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0578)