VA HB510 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-30 - House: Continued to 2009 in Appropriations by voice vote
Status: Introduced on January 7 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-30 - House: Continued to 2009 in Appropriations by voice vote
Summary
State medical assistance plan; DMAS to contract with DMHMRSAS for mental health services. Requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to contract with the Department of Mental Health, Mental Retardation and Substance Abuse Services to provide mental health services to eligible individuals in underserved areas of the Commonwealth.
Title
Medical assistance plan; DMAS to contract with DMHMRSAS for mental health services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-30 | House: Continued to 2009 in Appropriations by voice vote | |
2008-01-18 | House: Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources (Hamilton) | |
2008-01-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-01-17 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083170528 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB510 |