VA HB5099 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 16 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Search warrants; provide notice of authority. Prohibits any law-enforcement officer from seeking, executing, or participating in the execution of a no-knock search warrant. The bill provides that, for all authorized search warrants, the law-enforcement officer be recognizable and identifiable as a uniformed law-enforcement officer and that he provide audible notice of his authority and purpose reasonably expected to be heard by occupants of such place to be searched prior to the execution of such search warrant. It also requires that after entering and securing the place to be searched and prior to undertaking any search or seizure pursuant to the search warrant, the executing officer shall read and give a copy of the search warrant to the person to be searched or the owner of the place to be searched or, if the owner is not present, to any occupant of the place to be searched. If the place to be searched is unoccupied, the executing law-enforcement officer shall leave a copy of the search warrant suitably affixed to the place to be searched. The bill requires search warrants to be executed only in the daytime unless (i) a judge or magistrate, if a judge is not available, authorizes the execution of such search warrant at another time for good cause shown or (ii) the search warrant is for the withdrawal of blood.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Search warrants; provide notice of authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (56-Y 41-N) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (24-Y 12-N) (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Pending question ordered (19-Y 19-N) (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 4-N) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 41-N) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
2020-10-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020
2020-10-16SenateSigned by President
2020-10-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-16HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5099ER)
2020-10-16HouseEnrolled
2020-10-14SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 16-N)
2020-10-14SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-10-14HouseVOTE: Agreed To (56-Y 41-N)
2020-10-14HouseConference report agreed to by House (56-Y 41-N)
2020-10-14HouseConference substitute printed 20201359D-H1
2020-10-14 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenators: Surovell, Locke, Stuart
2020-10-07SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-10-07HouseDelegates: Herring, Aird, Campbell, J.L.
2020-10-07HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-10-07HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-10-07SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenate insisted on amendment (24-Y 12-N)
2020-10-07HouseVOTE: Rejected (0-Y 96-N)
2020-10-07HouseSenate substitute rejected by House (0-Y 96-N)
2020-10-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-10-02SenatePassed Senate with substitute (22-Y 17-N)
2020-10-02SenatePending question ordered (19-Y 19-N)
2020-10-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB5099S1
2020-10-02SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20201186D-S1
2020-10-02SenateCommittee substitute reconsidered (39-Y 0-N)
2020-10-02SenateSubstitute by Senator Locke withdrawn
2020-10-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-10-02SenateCommittee substitute rejected
2020-10-02SenateRead third time
2020-10-02SenateFloor substitute printed 20201294D-S2 (Locke)
2020-10-01SenatePassed by for the day
2020-10-01SenateRead third time
2020-10-01SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-09-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-24SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N)
2020-09-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-09-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201186D-S1
2020-09-16SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 4-N)
2020-09-09SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-09-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-04HouseVOTE: Passage (56-Y 41-N)
2020-09-04HouseRead third time and passed House (56-Y 41-N)
2020-09-03HousePrinted as engrossed 20200549D-E
2020-09-03HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB5099E
2020-09-03HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-09-03HouseRead second time
2020-08-28HouseRead first time
2020-08-26HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 7-N)
2020-08-20HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-08-20HousePresented and ordered printed 20200549D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19256(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5099&202+sum+HB5099
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5099+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5099E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5099S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5099S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5099H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5099ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H08V0016+HB5099
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0050+HB5099
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0068+HB5099
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0052+HB5099
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0151HB5099+HB5099
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0218HB5099+HB5099
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0219HB5099+HB5099
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0220HB5099+HB5099
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0180+HB5099
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0255HB5099+HB5099
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0288HB5099+HB5099
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0190+HB5099

Bill Comments

feedback