VA HB507 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Careers in Law Enforcement Incentive Grant Program established. Requires the Department of Education, with such funds as may be appropriated for such purpose pursuant to the general appropriation act, to establish and administer the Careers in Law Enforcement Incentive Grant Program whereby any school board may apply for a grant in an amount up to $250,000, to be awarded on a competitive basis, with which to offer courses relating to criminal justice or law enforcement in at least one public high school in the local school division.
Title
Careers in Law Enforcement Incentive Grant Program; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-29 | House | Reported from Education (14-Y 8-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 24105115D-H1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 8-N) |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Education |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103788D |