VA HB505 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0086)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0086)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of zoning appeals; writ of certiorari. Provides that once the writ of certiorari is served in response to a petition from a party aggrieved by a board of zoning appeals decision, the board of zoning appeals shall have 21 days or as ordered by the court to respond.
Title
Zoning appeals, board of; writ of certiorari.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0086) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 86 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020 | |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB505ER) |
2020-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-18 | House | VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Stuart agreed to |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-30 | House | VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 20102600D-E |
2020-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB505E |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2020-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102600D |