VA HB498 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Standards of Learning assessments and alternative assessment tools. Requires the Standards of Learning assessments administered to students (i) in grade three to be limited to English and mathematics, (ii) in grade four to be limited to English, mathematics, and the Virginia and Community history and social science assessment, (iii) in grade five to be limited to English, writing, mathematics, and science, and (iv) in grade six to be limited to English and mathematics, beginning with the 2015-2016 school year. The bill also requires the history and social science Standards of Learning assessment in grades seven through 12 to be limited to History, Economy, and Civics in grade eight and Modern World and United States History in grade 10, 11, or 12, beginning with the 2015-2016 school year. The bill requires the Board of Education, by January 1, 2015, to establish guidelines for the development of alternative assessment tools by local school boards and permits the Board to (i) limit the initial number of school divisions that are permitted to develop and implement alternative assessment tools in accordance with Board guidelines and (ii) develop a phased process for the implementation of the alternative assessment tools by local school boards that aligns implementation in each subject area with the regular cycle of Standards of Learning assessment review and updates. The bill provides that in school divisions in which the school board has adopted approved authentic assessment methodologies for the history and social science and science Standards of Learning that include approved verification measures that provide explicit data on student learning, the Board shall waive the history and social science and science Standards of Learning assessment requirements.
Title
Standards of Learning; assessments and alternative assessment tools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Education |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100823D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB498 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB498+hil |