VA HB491 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State lottery; method of payment for purchase of tickets. Clarifies that licensed lottery sales agents may accept electronic payment, provided such payment deducts funds directly from an existing account of the purchaser and no credit is thereby extended.
Title
State lottery; method of payment for purchase of tickets.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in General Laws |
2014-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred from Finance by voice vote |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101806D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB491 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB491+hil |