VA HB490 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; cost of living supplements. Provides that cost of living supplements shall be payable to claimants who are receiving disability benefits under the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act but are not receiving federal disability benefits.
Title
Workers' compensation; cost of living supplements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2016-02-09 | House | Continued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2016-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Workers Comp |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102733D |