VA HB490 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0502)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0502)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certain executive branch boards and councils; staggering of terms; membership; name change. Provides for the staggering of terms for the membership of the Modeling and Simulation Advisory Council, the Asian Advisory Board, and the State Emergency Medical Services Advisory Board. The bill also reduces the membership of the Board of Trustees of the Virginia Museum of Natural History from 25 to 15. The bill also changes the name of the Council on the Status of Women to the Council on Women and adds certain duties. The bill also changes the membership of the Virginia Offshore Wind Development Authority and reduces its number from 11 to nine. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Executive branch boards and councils, certain; staggering of terms, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0502) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 502 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-29 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB490ER) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB490H1 | |
2012-01-31 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104744D-H1 | |
2012-01-31 | House: Read second time | |
2012-01-30 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-26 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104744D-H1 | |
2012-01-26 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103738D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 2002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2449 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2630 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2631 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2698 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 111.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |