VA HB486 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Thomas Jefferson High School for Science and Technology; admissions requirements. Requires the Thomas Jefferson High School for Science and Technology academic year Governor's School in Fairfax County to annually admit for first-time enrollment as freshmen at least 100 students who reside in the Loudoun County school division.
Title
Thomas Jefferson High School for Science and Technology; admissions requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Education |
2022-02-10 | House | Rereferred to Education |
2022-02-10 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105439D-H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103240D |