VA HB486 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-03 - Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-03 - Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Human trafficking of children; reports and investigation. Requires individuals currently required to report suspected child abuse or neglect to also report suspected cases of human trafficking of a child and specifies the duties of local departments of social services and courts with regard to investigating complaints of suspected human trafficking of a child.
Title
Human trafficking of children; reports and investigation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | House | Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2014-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-14 | House | Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102854D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 1502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1503.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB486 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB486+hil |