VA HB485 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0828)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0828)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Financial and management review of all state agencies. Directs the Governor to initiate on July 1, 2010, an operational and programmatic performance review of (i) the agencies under the Secretary of Health and Human Resources and the Secretary of Public Safety, (ii) the Department of Education, including primary and secondary education funded by the Commonwealth, and (iii) any other department, agency, or program of the Commonwealth in the executive branch of state government that the Governor deems necessary to effect savings in expenditures, a reduction in duplication of effort, and programmatic efficiencies in the operation of state government. The review shall be concluded by December 1, 2011. The review shall be conducted by a private management consulting firm. The goal of the review is to effect savings in expenditures, a reduction in duplication of effort, and programmatic efficiencies in the operation of state government. The review would be conducted only pursuant to a fixed price contract.
Title
Governor; shall initiate an operational and programmatic performance review of state agencies.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] | Del. Richard Anderson [R] | Del. Clifford Athey [R] | Del. Richard Bell [R] |
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Scott Garrett [R] | Del. Todd Gilbert [R] | Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] |
Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0828) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 828 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB485ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 1-N) | |
2010-04-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB485ER) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-02 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 2-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB485H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105154D-H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105154D-H1 | |
2010-02-12 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | House: Assigned App. sub: Technology Oversight and Government Activities | |
2010-01-28 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-01-28 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Appropriations by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101010D |