VA HB484 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0326)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0326)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic cigarettes in public elementary and secondary schools. Requires each school board to (i) develop and implement a policy to prohibit the use of electronic cigarettes on a school bus, on school property, or at a school-sponsored activity and (ii) include in its code of student conduct a prohibition against possessing electronic cigarettes on a school bus, on school property, or at a school-sponsored activity. The bill requires school boards to update their policies and codes of student conduct by July 1, 2015.
Title
Electronic cigarettes; prohibited in public elementary and secondary schools.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Rob Krupicka [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (54-Y 42-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (54-Y 42-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0326) | |
2014-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 326 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB484ER) |
2014-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (54-Y 42-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 42-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100812D |