VA HB478 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
High school graduation and dropout data; formula; on-time graduation. Requires the formula that the Board of Education uses to collect, analyze, report, and make available to the public high school graduation and dropout data to exclude any student who fails to graduate on time because of an extenuating circumstance and requires the Board of Education to enumerate such extenuating circumstances pursuant to regulation.
Title
High school graduation and dropout data; on-time graduation.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Education |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101711D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB478 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB478+hil |