VA HB478 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - House: Stricken from docket by Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - House: Stricken from docket by Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Gunston Hall; administration. Clarifies that, consistent with existing law, any administrative head of Gunston Hall, the home of George Mason bequeathed to the Commonwealth by a former owner, is appointed by the Governor to serve at his pleasure. Additionally, the Board of Visitors of Gunston Hall shall appoint a Board of Advisors to assist in its fulfillment of reporting responsibilities set out in the deed of gift regarding the management of Gunston Hall.
Title
Gunston Hall; administrative head is appointed by Governor, report.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-06 | House: Stricken from docket by Education by voice vote | |
2012-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned Education sub: Higher Education and Arts | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103647D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB478 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB478+hil |