VA HB471 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Service agencies and technicians. Requires that a weights and measures service agency include in its applications for registration or renewal proof of a uniquely identifiable security seal. The bill also clarifies that service technicians who seek certification must complete a certification or recertification training course and that annual renewal of certification is subject to completion of a training course every three years.
Title
Service agencies and technicians; certification qualifications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100450D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB471 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB471+hil |