VA HB470 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0503)
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0503)
Summary
Loitering in the rights-of-way of certain highways. Prohibits loitering in the right-of-way of any highway where it has been determined that loitering presents a public safety hazard and the VDOT Commissioner or the local governing body has posted signs prohibiting such activity.
Title
Loitering; prohibited in right-of-way of certain highways with posted signs.
Sponsors
Del. Kristen Amundson [D] | Sen. Dave Marsden [D] | Del. Brian Moran [D] | Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Del. Edward Scott [R] | Del. James Scott [D] | Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0503) | |
2008-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 503 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-04 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB470ER) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-28 | House: VOTE: (95-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-28 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 083561784-S1 (95-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB470S1 | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 083561784-S1 | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 083561784-S1 | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-22 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-22 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | House: Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | House: Printed as engrossed 084516784-E | |
2008-01-21 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB470E | |
2008-01-21 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-01-21 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-18 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-17 | House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084516784 |
Subjects
Advertising and Advertisements
Counties, Cities and Towns
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Motor Vehicles
Counties, Cities and Towns
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Motor Vehicles
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB470 |