VA HB469 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-25 - House: Continued to 2013 in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-25 - House: Continued to 2013 in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Algebra readiness assessment. Requires the Board of Education to develop or approve a model assessment of algebra readiness for students to take prior to enrolling in non-remedial algebra. Beginning with the 2014-2015 academic year, every student shall be required to take an algebra readiness test.
Title
Algebra readiness assessment; Board of Education to develop or approve for students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | House: Continued to 2013 in Education by voice vote | |
2012-01-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned Education sub: Standards Of Quality | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101370D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB469 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB469+hil |