VA HB467 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Council of Higher Education for Virginia; interstate agreements. Authorizes the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia (SCHEV) to enter into interstate reciprocity agreements authorizing postsecondary distance education. SCHEV will administer the agreements and will approve or disapprove participation in the agreements by degree-granting institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth. Participation in the agreements by the institutions is voluntary. The bill also requires SCHEV to establish the Distance Learning Reciprocity Advisory Council, which will include representatives from each participating institution.
Title
Higher Education for Virginia, State Council of; interstate agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323) | |
2014-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 323 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB467ER) |
2014-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-20 | House | Reported from Education (20-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101765D |