VA HB464 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Respite Care Registry. Directs the Department for the Aging to establish and maintain the Respite Care Registry to make information about adult day services providers, community respite care organizations, and other providers of respite care available to the public. The bill also establishes the Virginia Respite Care Fund, to consist of voluntary income tax contributions to support the Respite Care Registry.
Title
Virginia Respite Care Registry and Fund; established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-03 | House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-01-21 | House: Continued to 2011 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote | |
2010-01-21 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-01-18 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #2 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101851D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 714 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 714.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 715 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 716 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 344.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB464 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB464+hil |