VA HB461 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Status: Introduced on January 4 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Summary
Conditions of release without bond. Provides that no person arrested for a felony who has previously been convicted of a felony, or who is presently on bond for an unrelated arrest in any jurisdiction, or who is on probation or parole, may be released to a pretrial services agency in lieu of posting a secure bond until the expiration of 72 hours following his initial appearance before a judicial officer and unless he is determined by a court to be indigent.
Title
Bond; conditions of release without.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-12 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2008-02-05 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety (Sherwood) | |
2008-02-01 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-01 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088705404 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB461 |