VA HB460 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cumberlands Airport Commission. Establishes a new charter for the Cumberlands Airport Commission and repeals the current charter, which was created in 1958. The proposed charter sets out the organization of the Commission and contains powers and duties typically granted for authorities. The bill also removes the Town of Lebanon and the Counties of Lee and Russell from the Commission.
Title
Cumberlands Airport Commission; establishes a new charter, repeals current charter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192) | |
2024-03-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 192 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB460ER) |
2024-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB460H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107478D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107478D-H1 |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Highway Safety and Policy |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103565D |
Same As/Similar To
SB728 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0261)