VA HB460 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; motion picture production credit. Changes the motion picture production income tax credit by (i) increasing the total cap for all such credits from $5 million per biennium to $6.5 million each fiscal year and (ii) having the credit expire on December 31, 2018. The bill also requires the Department of Taxation to publish information regarding the credit even if such information is not classified so as to prevent the identification of the taxpayer claiming the credit.
Title
Income tax; motion picture production credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 5-N) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 22-N 1-A) (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate requested second conference committee (38-Y 2-Y) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 85-N 1-A) (Y: 5 N: 87 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 21-N 1-A) (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 2-N) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 22-N 1-A) (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate requested second conference committee (38-Y 2-Y) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 85-N 1-A) (Y: 5 N: 87 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 21-N 1-A) (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 2-N) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 730 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB460ER) |
2014-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 5-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 22-N 1-A) |
2014-03-04 | House | Second conference report agreed to by House (75-Y 22-N 1-A) |
2014-03-04 | House | Conference substitute printed 14105529D-H2 |
2014-03-04 | House | Delegates: Kilgore, Jones, Spruill |
2014-03-04 | House | Second conferees appointed by House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senators: Watkins, Lucas, Puller |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Second conferees appointed by Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | House acceded to request for second conference committee |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate requested second conference committee (38-Y 2-Y) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2014-03-03 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2014-02-26 | House | Delegates: Kilgore, Jones, Spruill |
2014-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senators: Watkins, Lucas, Puller |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2014-02-26 | House | House acceded to request |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 85-N 1-A) |
2014-02-26 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (5-Y 85-N 1-A) |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 4-N) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 21-N 1-A) |
2014-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (75-Y 21-N 1-A) |
2014-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 14104663D-EH1 |
2014-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB460EH1 |
2014-02-06 | House | Amendments by Delegate Kilgore agreed to |
2014-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104663D-H1 |
2014-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104663D-H1 |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101016D |