VA HB460 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - House: Passed by in General Laws with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - House: Passed by in General Laws with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Minority Business Enterprise. Changes the name of the Department of Minority Business Enterprise to the Department of Supplier Diversity and Procurement Advocacy and moves the Department to the responsibilities of the Secretary of Administration from the Secretary of Commerce and Trade. The bill contains numerous technical amendments.
Title
Minority Business Enterprise; changes name to Supplier Diversity & Procurement Advocacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | House: Passed by in General Laws with letter by voice vote | |
2010-02-04 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101364D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 965.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 205.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |