VA HB453 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Continued to 2015 in Finance by voice vote
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Continued to 2015 in Finance by voice vote
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Corporate income taxes. Establishes beginning with the 2015 taxable year a $25,000 taxable income threshold for corporate income tax liability and increases from $1,000 to $1,500 the minimum amount of income tax a corporation expects to pay to require the corporation to make estimated payments of income tax. The bill also provides that a corporation exempt from income tax would still be required to file a corporate income tax return if the corporation's gross revenues for the taxable year exceeded $500,000. The $25,000 taxable income threshold and the $1,500 of minimum expected income tax would be adjusted annually for inflation beginning with taxable year 2016.
Title
Income tax, corporate; exemption, filing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | House | Continued to 2015 in Finance by voice vote |
2014-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103445D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB453 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB453+hil |