VA HB453 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0291)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0291)
Summary
School bus stop indicators. Provides that local school boards may install signs or other devices to indicate school bus stops. Installation of these signs or devices is subject to VDOT approval if installed on any state-maintained highway. Maintenance, repair, and replacement of these school bus stop signs is to be the responsibility of the local school board. VDOT, in conformance with its current policies for emergency snow removal operations, must use its best efforts to ensure that signed school bus stop areas will not be obstructed by snow removal operations.
Title
School bus stops; local school boards may install signs or other devices to indicate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0291) | |
2008-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 291 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB453ER) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-25 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-21 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-28 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB453H1 | |
2008-01-25 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 083519708-H1 | |
2008-01-25 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-24 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-23 | House: Committee substitute printed 083519708-H1 | |
2008-01-22 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (17-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087048708 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB453 |