VA HB451 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0566)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0566)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; elected and certain appointed officers; removal from office. Adds sexual battery, attempted sexual battery, consensual intercourse with a child 15 years of age or older, indecent exposure, and peeping to the list of offenses for which a circuit court, upon petition, may remove from office an elected officer or officer appointed to fill an elective office.
Title
Elections; elected and certain appointed officers, removal from office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0566) | |
2014-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 566 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB451ER) |
2014-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB451H1 |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104343D-H1 |
2014-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-24 | House | Incorporates HB408 |
2014-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104343D-H1 |
2014-01-24 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments Subcommittee |
2014-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101290D |
Same As/Similar To
HB408 (Similar To) 2014-01-24 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections