VA HB447 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Broadband providers; affordable monthly plan. Requires each broadband provider operating in the Commonwealth to offer an affordable monthly plan for broadband services that (i) does not exceed $50 per month and (ii) meets the faster of either (a) the standards for advanced service as defined by the Federal Communications Commission or (b) a minimum broadband speed level of 50 megabits per second for download speed and 25 megabits per second for upload speed.
Title
Broadband providers; affordable monthly plan.
Sponsors
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2023 by voice vote |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100784D |